Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giacomo della Bona

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1814Born
20 Jan 183823.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trento, Italy
25 Jan 183823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
4 May 187459.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
4 May 187459.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tenedus
14 Jun 187459.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tenedus
16 Jun 187964.5SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
27 Feb 188065.2ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
19 Mar 188065.3InstalledBishop of Trento, Italy
17 Nov 188570.9DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giacomo della Bona (VIAF: 295733544)
Bishop Giovanni Giacomo della Bona (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceG÷rz
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 540, and Page 566
  • c3: CB, 26 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1874, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017