Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes von Leiß (Leiss)

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1821BornInnsbruck
25 Jul 184524.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
27 Jul 184524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
16 Jun 187958.0SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
27 Feb 188058.7ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
4 Apr 188058.8Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
23 Apr 188462.8DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Johannes von Leiß (Leiss):
Bishop Johannes von Leiß (Leiss) (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013