Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franz de Paula Albert Eder, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1818Born
3 Apr 184224.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
11 Mar 184325.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Aug 184325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
27 May 187658.3SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
29 Sep 187658.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
22 Oct 187658.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
10 Apr 189072.1DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franz de Paula Albert Eder (VIAF: 40187059)
Archbishop Franz de Paula Albert Eder O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHallein, Archdiocese of Salzburg
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 493
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1876, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017