Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentin Wiery

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1813Born
24 Aug 183522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lavant, Slovenia
30 Oct 185845.7AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
21 Nov 185845.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
29 Dec 188067.8DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Valentin Wiery (VIAF: 40153964)
Bishop Valentin Wiery (born , died ) Bishop of Gurk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSte Marie de Lavant, Diocese of Lavant, Slovenia, Slovenia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1858, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017