Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Chrysostomos Pogacar (Fogacar)

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1811Born
26 Jul 183423.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Jul 183423.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 187564.5AppointedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
5 Sep 187564.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
25 Jan 188473.0DiedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Johann Chrysostomos Pogacar (Fogacar) (VIAF: 8450803)
Bishop Johann Chrysostomos Pogacar (Fogacar) (born , died ) Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVrba, Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)
Ordained BishopLaybach, Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 330
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017