Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andreas Gollmayr

Deceased

Archbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1797Born
23 Sep 182123.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 185456.9SelectedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
23 Mar 185557.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
3 Jun 185557.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
17 Mar 188385.3DiedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andreas Gollmayr
Archbishop Andreas Gollmayr (born , died ) Archbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadmannsdorf, Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 289
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017