Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alojz Matija Zorn

Deceased

Archbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1834Born
18 Sep 185622.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 185622.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Aug 188248.6SelectedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
25 Sep 188248.6ConfirmedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
14 Jan 188349.0Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
9 Jul 188349.4SelectedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
9 Aug 188349.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
9 Jul 189763.4DiedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alojz Matija Zorn (VIAF: 67653377)
Archbishop Alojz Matija Zorn (born , died ) Archbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrvačina, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca
Ordained BishopCathedral, Gorizia, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 289, and Page 440
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017