Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franjo Anijan Feretić (Ferrettić)

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1816Born
26 Dec 183923.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Dec 183923.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 187963.0SelectedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
27 Feb 188063.2ConfirmedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
23 May 188063.4Ordained BishopBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
19 Mar 189376.2DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Franjo Anijan Feretić (Ferrettić)
Bishop Franjo Anijan Feretić (Ferrettić) (born , died ) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVrbnik
Ordained BishopGorizia, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1894
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 583
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017