Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Léopold Brigido von Marenfels und Bresoviz

Deceased

Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1742Born
13 Jan 176522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Seckau, Austria
21 Aug 178745.5SelectedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
5 Dec 178745.8SelectedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
7 Apr 178846.1ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
27 Apr 178846.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
24 Oct 180664.7SelectedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
23 Mar 180765.1ConfirmedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
23 Jul 181674.4DiedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Michael Léopold Brigido von Marenfels und Bresoviz
Archbishop Michael Léopold Brigido von Marenfels und Bresoviz (born , died ) Bishop of Spiš

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrieste, Italy

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,800
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 336
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018