Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan (István) Csech (Cech)

Deceased

Bishop of Košice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1762³BornEperjes
29 Sep 178624.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Oct 178624.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 181250.0SelectedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
26 Sep 181452.3ConfirmedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
15 May 181553.0Ordained BishopBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
29 Sep 182058.4SelectedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
8 Jan 182158.6ConfirmedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
8 May 182159.0InstalledBishop of Košice, Slovakia
4 Jun 183169.0DiedBishop of Košice, Slovakia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefan (István) Csech (Cech):
Bishop Stefan (István) Csech (Cech) (born , died ) Bishop of Košice

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 108, and Page 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013