Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Košice

Archidioecesis Cassoviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Bernard Bober, Archbishop
  • Stanislav Stolárik, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Alojz Tkáč, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 31 March 1995
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Slovakia
  • Square Kilometers: 10,403 (4,018 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rimkat.sk/
  • Mailing Address: Arcibiskupsky urad, Hlavna ulica 28, SK-041 83 Kosice, Slovenska Republika
  • Telephone: (055)68.28.101
  • Fax: 62.21.034

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Košice
10 August 1804ErectedArchdiocese of Eger Diocese of Košice (erected)
30 December 1977Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Košice (from Eger)
Archdiocese of Košice
31 March 1995ElevatedDiocese of Košice Archdiocese of Košice

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Košice
1948292,681570,43051.3%240372771,05654490166ap1951
1969549,158785,94969.9%2032032,705174ap1971
1980605,300887,00068.2%2502502,421181ap1981
1990740,611998,05374.2%2312313,206181ap1991
Archdiocese of Košice
1999612,6421,050,63958.3%285603451,7752129348202ap2000
2000616,3431,066,12757.8%303563591,7162102239203ap2001
2001608,2601,045,14658.2%319653841,5842134366203ap2002
2002676,3331,118,29560.5%333633961,7072127371204ap2003
2003678,1741,120,13660.5%342614031,6822120349206ap2004
2004678,1741,118,29560.6%348564041,6782116340207ap2005
2006678,1701,111,13261.0%382654471,517399364210ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 7 Jul 2013