Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jozef Kunszt

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1790BornZubrohlaván
1 Aug 181323.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Aug 181323.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 185059.8SelectedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
20 May 185059.9ConfirmedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
25 Aug 185060.2Ordained BishopBishop of Košice, Slovakia
6 Oct 185060.3InstalledBishop of Košice, Slovakia
15 Mar 185261.7AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
5 Jan 186675.5DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Jozef Kunszt:
Archbishop Jozef Kunszt (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 189, and Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013