Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sándor Bonnaz

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1812Born
6 Aug 183724.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Aug 183725.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 186047.8SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
28 Sep 186048.1ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
4 Nov 186048.2Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
9 Aug 188976.9DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Sándor Bonnaz
Bishop Sándor Bonnaz (born , died ) Bishop of Csanád

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChallex, France
Ordained BishopKalocsa, Archdiocese of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017