Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Nehiba

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Knin (Tinin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1794Born
15 Sep 181622.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kalocsa, Hungary
15 Feb 181823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kalocsa, Hungary
23 Aug 185561.1SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
20 Dec 185561.4ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
20 Dec 185561.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
30 Mar 185661.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
21 Jan 187580.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for János Nehiba
Bishop János Nehiba (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBács, Archdiocese of Kalocsa
Ordained BishopKalocsa, Archdiocese of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 554
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017