Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Csajŕghy

Deceased

Bishop of Csanád, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1810Born
20 Sep 183323.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kalocsa, Hungary
21 Sep 183323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kalocsa, Hungary
11 Apr 185141.0SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
5 Sep 185141.4ConfirmedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
26 Oct 185141.5Ordained BishopBishop of Csanád, Hungary
7 Feb 186049.8DiedBishop of Csanád, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Csajŕghy
Bishop Alessandro Csajŕghy (born , died ) Bishop of Csanád

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBács, Archdiocese of Kalocsa
Ordained BishopKalocsa, Archdiocese of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017