Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Péter Klobusiczky

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1754³BornFejér-Gyarmat
17 Oct 176915.3ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
24 Aug 177420.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
25 Sep 177521.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 Jul 180753.0SelectedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
11 Jan 180853.5ConfirmedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
21 Feb 180853.7Ordained BishopBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
21 Dec 182167.5SelectedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
19 Apr 182267.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
2 Jul 184389.0DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Péter Klobusiczky:
Archbishop Péter Klobusiczky (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 67.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 156, and Page 356

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013