Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Szanyi

Deceased

Bishop of Rožňava, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1740Born
21 Apr 176423.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Sep 176423.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 180160.6SelectedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
23 Dec 180161.1ConfirmedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
21 Feb 180261.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
29 Mar 181069.4DiedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Szanyi
Bishop Ferenc Szanyi (born , died ) Bishop of Rožňava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTornae

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 1
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018