Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Francesco Kertiza

Deceased

Bishop of Bosnia (Bosna)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1726BornFlumen Sancti Viti, Croatia
20 Sep 174922.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Sep 174923.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 177346.5SelectedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
20 Dec 177347.2ConfirmedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
27 Feb 177447.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
31 May 180578.6DiedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Matteo Francesco Kertiza:
Bishop Matteo Francesco Kertiza (born , died ) Bishop of Bosnia (Bosna)

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 128
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 7
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806, Page 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Dec 2015