Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franjo Klobusiczky

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1707BornEger
24 Sep 172921.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 173628.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nemesi
6 May 173628.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nemesi
21 Apr 174133.3SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
24 Sep 174234.8ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
13 May 174840.4SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
2 Dec 174841.0ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
30 Jul 175143.6SelectedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
20 Dec 175144.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
6 Apr 176052.3DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Franjo Klobusiczky:
Archbishop Franjo Klobusiczky (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 173, and Page 305
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 412, and Page 448
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015