Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franjo Thauszy

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1698³Born
21 Mar 172223.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Apr 172224.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 174951.3SelectedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
1 Dec 174951.6ConfirmedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
12 Apr 175052.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
30 Jul 175153.3SelectedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
24 Jan 175253.8ConfirmedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
11 Jan 176970.8DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franjo Thauszy
Bishop Franjo Thauszy (born , died ) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZagreb

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 127, and Page 448
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast