Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josephus Antonius Bajtay, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1717BornZsido
28 Dec 174023.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Pious Schools
15 Jan 174123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
6 Apr 176143.3AppointedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
1 May 176143.3Ordained BishopBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
Oct 1772³54.7ResignedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
15 Jan 177355.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josephus Antonius Bajtay:
Bishop Josephus Antonius Bajtay Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 413
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 24 Nov 2015