Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georgius Wolfgangus Chiolich

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1699BornSenj
28 Oct 172324.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Nov 172324.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 174646.7SelectedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
18 Apr 174646.8ConfirmedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
22 May 174646.9Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
3 Jan 176464.5DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Georgius Wolfgangus Chiolich:
Bishop Georgius Wolfgangus Chiolich (born , died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 372
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015