Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sigismund Cardinal Kollonitsch

Deceased

Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1676BornNagy Levar
22 Oct 169923.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Oct 170933.3AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
7 Dec 170933.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
16 Apr 171639.8SelectedBishop of Wien, Austria
1 Jul 171640.0ConfirmedBishop of Wien, Austria
1 Jun 172246.0AppointedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
26 Nov 172751.4Elevated to Cardinal
14 Aug 173054.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
29 Aug 174064.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
12 Apr 175174.8DiedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Sigismund Kollonitsch:
Sigismund Cardinal Kollonitsch (born , died ) Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
  • a cardinal for 23.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1727
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,037
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015