Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juraj Branjug

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1682¹Born
26 Nov 172745.9AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
7 Mar 172846.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
19 Mar 172846.2InstalledBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
28 Apr 174866.3DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juraj Branjug (VIAF: 305607472)
Bishop Juraj Branjug (born 1682, died ) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZagreb, Diocese of Zagreb (Agram)
Ordained BishopZagreb, Diocese of Zagreb (Agram)

  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 421
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 9
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,880
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,072

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast