Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Paolo Maricone, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Hippos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1682¹Born
20 Dec 170422.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Clerks Regular of Somasca
18 Sep 170624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
15 Dec 172846.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
24 Aug 172947.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paolo Maricone
Bishop Giovanni Paolo Maricone C.R.S. (born 1682) Titular Bishop of Hippos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 221
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018