Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Christoph Ludwig von Kuenburg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

Titular Bishop of Abdera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1697BornGraz
13 Oct 172629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
3 Jul 174749.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
3 Jul 174749.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
30 Jul 174749.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
18 Aug 175658.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Christoph Ludwig von Kuenburg:
Bishop Johannes Christoph Ludwig von Kuenburg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Passau

  • a priest for 29.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013