Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franz Anton von Harrach zu Rorau

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1663BornWien
30 Dec 169128.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
2 Jul 170137.7SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Wien, Austria
21 Nov 170138.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Wien, Austria
21 Nov 170138.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria
7 Jan 170238.2SucceededBishop of Wien, Austria
2 Apr 170238.5Ordained BishopBishop of Wien, Austria
19 Oct 170542.0SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria
19 Apr 170642.5ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria
31 Jul 170642.8ResignedBishop of Wien, Austria
20 Apr 170945.5SucceededArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
27 May 170945.6InstalledArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
19 Jul 172763.7DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franz Anton von Harrach zu Rorau:
Archbishop Franz Anton von Harrach zu Rorau (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 196, and Page 341
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015