Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Ernst von Wartenberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1635BornMünchen
24 Sep 166126.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Regensburg, Germany
25 Mar 166226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
10 Nov 168752.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
10 Nov 168752.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
16 May 168852.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
9 Oct 171580.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Albert Ernst von Wartenberg:
Bishop Albert Ernst von Wartenberg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 235, and Page 328
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 24 Apr 2015