Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Christoph Rinck von Balderstein

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Titular Bishop of Amyclae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1641Born
20 Jan 166422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
15 May 168443.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
15 May 168443.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
12 Nov 168443.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
6 May 170766.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Christoph Rinck von Balderstein
Bishop Franz Christoph Rinck von Balderstein (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJonschwil

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 82
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 24
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,602
  • b/c2+: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017