Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Euchar von Schenk von Castell

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1625BornRomanshorn
24 Sep 167247.4Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
13 Mar 168559.9SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
7 Jul 168762.2ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
9 May 168863.1Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
6 Mar 169771.9DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Euchar von Schenk von Castell:
Bishop Johann Euchar von Schenk von Castell (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 197
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 24 Apr 2015