Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Eustach Egolf von Westernach

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Dioclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1649BornAbron
20 Apr 168030.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Augsburg, Germany
15 Jun 168030.6Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
23 Jun 168131.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
23 Jun 168131.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
14 Sep 168131.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
28 Sep 170757.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Eustach Egolf von Westernach:
Bishop Johann Eustach Egolf von Westernach (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015