Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Veit Adam Gepeckh von Arnsbach

Deceased

Bishop of Freising


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1584BornArnsbach
161732.5Ordained PriestPriest of Freising, Germany
12 Feb 161833.7SelectedBishop of Freising, Germany
14 May 161833.9ConfirmedBishop of Freising, Germany
24 Jun 161834.0Ordained BishopBishop of Freising, Germany
8 Dec 165167.5DiedBishop of Freising, Germany

MicroData Summary for Veit Adam Gepeckh von Arnsbach:
Bishop Veit Adam Gepeckh von Arnsbach (born , died ) Bishop of Freising

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB, 31 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 31 Oct 2013