Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Pius V

St. Antonio (Michele) Ghislieri, O.P. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1504Born
1518²13.9EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
152116.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1528²23.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
4 Sep 155652.6AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
14 Sep 155652.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
15 Mar 155753.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 155753.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
27 Mar 156056.1AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
14 Apr 156157.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
15 May 156561.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
7 Jan 156661.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
17 Jan 156662.0InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 May 157268.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 May 1672Beatified
22 May 1712Canonized

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Antonio (Michele) Ghislieri (VIAF: 89607114)
Pope St. Antonio (Michele) Ghislieri O.P. (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBosco Marengo, Diocese of Alessandria (della Paglia)
Ordained PriestGenoa
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Andrea Chapel, St. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)Ss. Sacramento Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
  • a cardinal for 8.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1557
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 306, and Page 250
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1556, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast