Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Gāmbara

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1533Born
26 Feb 156128.0Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 156128.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
17 Nov 156532.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
7 Oct 156633.6AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
13 Oct 156633.6Ordained BishopBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
3 Jul 157037.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
17 Oct 157239.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
28 Mar 157643.1ResignedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
9 Jul 157845.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
17 Aug 157946.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
5 Dec 158047.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
4 Mar 158350.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
5 May 158754.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Gāmbara (VIAF: 1127331)
Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Gāmbara (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia, Italy
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria Vergine della Quercia, Viterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
  • a cardinal for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 38, and Page 336
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 10, Number 20
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018