Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Cardinal Pacheco de Villena (Toledo)

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1508¹BornCiudad Rodrigo
25 Feb 156153.1Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jul 156456.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Susanna
7 Feb 156557.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Pudenziana
17 Nov 156557.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
8 Aug 156759.6AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
26 Oct 156759.8Ordained BishopBishop of Burgos, Spain
22 Aug 157466.6AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
23 Aug 157971.6DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Pacheco de Villena (Toledo):
Francisco Cardinal Pacheco de Villena (Toledo) (died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
  • a cardinal for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 25 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 39, and Page 143
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 12, Number 34
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 78, Number 463

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015