Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Rodríguez de Pazos y Figueroa

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1524¹Born
17 Sep 156844.7AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
8 Dec 156844.9Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
29 Oct 157854.8ResignedBishop of Patti, Italy
19 Mar 158258.2AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
28 Jun 158662.4DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Rodríguez de Pazos y Figueroa
Bishop Antonio Rodríguez de Pazos y Figueroa (born 1524, died ) Bishop of Córdoba

EventPlace
Birth Place
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 178
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 13, Number 43
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 79, Number 470
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018