Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Albornoz, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
27 Aug 157040.6SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
8 Nov 157040.8ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
22 Jul 157141.5Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
27 Oct 157444.8DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Albornoz
Bishop Jerónimo Albornoz O.F.M. (born 1530, died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain
Ordained BishopS. Yves, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 320
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 18, Number 71
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 81, Number 487
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018