Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Leo XI

Alessandro Ottaviano de’ Medici

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1535BornFlorence
22 Jul 156732.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 157337.8AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
9 Mar 157337.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia, Italy
15 Jan 157438.6AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
12 Dec 158348.5Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 158448.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
14 Jan 159155.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
14 Feb 159256.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
27 Apr 159458.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
21 Feb 160064.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
30 Aug 160065.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
17 Jun 160267.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
1 Apr 160569.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
10 Apr 160569.9InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
27 Apr 160569.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Ottaviano de’ Medici:
Pope Alessandro Ottaviano de’ Medici (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
  • a cardinal for 21.3 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,823
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014