Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cinzio Cardinal Passeri Aldobrandini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1551Born
17 Sep 159342.7Elevated to Cardinal
11 Oct 159342.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
13 Apr 160554.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 160554.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
1 Jan 161059.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

MicroData Summary for Cinzio Passeri Aldobrandini (VIAF: 62354985)
Cinzio Cardinal Passeri Aldobrandini (born 1551, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSenigallia, Diocese of Senigallia, Italy
Ordained PriestPope's Private, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)San Pietro in Vincoli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 4.7 years
  • a cardinal for 16.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Sep 1593
  • op/c1: AT, 12 Mar 2017
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Apr 2017