Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lucio Cardinal Sanseverino

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565²BornNapoli
2 Dec 159227.9AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
21 Dec 159227.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
19 Nov 161247.8AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
1 Jun 161954.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
1 May 162156.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
21 Jul 162156.5Elevated to Cardinal
30 Aug 162156.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
27 Sep 162358.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
25 Dec 162358.9DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lucio Sanseverino (VIAF: 257662404)
Lucio Cardinal Sanseverino (born 1565, died ) Archbishop of Salerno

  • a bishop for 31.0 years
  • a cardinal for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Jul 1621
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 297, and Page 301
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 286
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 284

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016