Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philippus Rovenius

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission)

Titular Archbishop of Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹BornDeventer
1599¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Oct 161439.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands
17 Aug 162045.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
8 Nov 162045.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
10 Oct 1651³76.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippus Rovenius:
Archbishop Philippus Rovenius (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission)

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015