Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques Boonen

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1573BornAntwerpen
28 May 161137.6Ordained PriestPriest of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
28 Nov 161643.1AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
5 Feb 161743.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
7 Jul 162046.7SelectedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
13 Oct 162148.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
30 Jun 165581.7DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jacques Boonen: VIAF:12461259
Archbishop Jacques Boonen (born , died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 236, and Page 193
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,521
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 23 Feb 2015