Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Paul Stravius

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Dionysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornKuttekoven
163141.0Ordained PriestPriest of Liège, Belgium
1634²44.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Flanders, Belgium
21 Oct 164151.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
21 Oct 164151.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
1642²52.0ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Flanders, Belgium
2 Feb 164252.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
24 Jan 165464.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard Paul Stravius (VIAF: 90840225)
Bishop Richard Paul Stravius (born 1590, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 23.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 10
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016