Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Sonnius (Van de Velde)

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1506Born
10 Mar 156154.5AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
8 Nov 156256.2Ordained BishopBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
13 Mar 157063.5AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
29 Jun 157669.8DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for François Sonnius (Van de Velde)
Bishop François Sonnius (Van de Velde) (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZon
Ordained BishopSte Gudule, Bruxelles
Death PlaceAnvers, Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 111, and Page 137
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast