Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Metz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1520¹Born
13 Mar 157050.1AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
23 Apr 157050.3Ordained BishopBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
Sep 1578³58.6ResignedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
18 Sep 158060.7DiedBishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Laurent Metz
Bishop Laurent Metz (born 1520, died ) Bishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrammont
Ordained BishopSte Gudule, Bruxelles
Death PlaceNamur

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 137
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018