Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aegidius (Gilles) Van den Bergh (de Monte), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Deventer, Netherlands


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Aug 1570AppointedBishop of Deventer, Netherlands
29 Oct 1570Ordained BishopBishop of Deventer, Netherlands
26 May 1577DiedBishop of Deventer, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Aegidius (Gilles) Van den Bergh (de Monte)
Bishop Aegidius (Gilles) Van den Bergh (de Monte) O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Bishop of Deventer

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerus, Belgium
Ordained BishopAnvers, Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
Death PlaceZwolle

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast