Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cambrai

Archidioecesis Cameracensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 1 October 1841
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lille
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 3,420 (1,320 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nord
  • Official Web Site: http://www.cathocambrai.com/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 30 rue de Noyon, B.P. 149, 59403 Cambrai CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 3.27.81.34.96
  • Fax: 3.27.81.34.91

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cambrai
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Cambrai (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Cambrai
Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Archdiocese of Utrecht
Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand} (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Cambrai
Diocese of Liège
Archdiocese of Mechelen (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Cambrai
Diocese of Liège
Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers} (erected)
12 May 1559Territory LostDiocese of Cambrai
Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Diocese of Middelburg (erected)
Archdiocese of Cambrai
12 May 1559ElevatedDiocese of Cambrai Archdiocese of Cambrai
Diocese of Cambrai
29 November 1801ElevatedArchdiocese of Cambrai Diocese of Cambrai
Archdiocese of Cambrai
1 October 1841ElevatedDiocese of Cambrai Archdiocese of Cambrai
25 October 1913Territory LostArchdiocese of Cambrai Diocese of Lille (erected)
30 March 2008ElevatedArchdiocese of Cambrai (no longer a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Cambrai
1949838,000839,77399.8%599156141,3641517493ap1951
1959894,500919,67197.3%674367101,25922640452ap1960
19701,043,486.0%565356000591,075452ap1971
19801,015,0001,050,00096.7%474345081,998157725459ap1981
19901,048,0001,081,00096.9%376223982,633739567459ap1991
1999963,0001,031,78693.3%306113173,0372811424452ap2000
2000963,0001,031,78693.3%278192973,2422825425452ap2001
2001980,0001,050,39493.3%313173302,9692717414452ap2002
2002998,0001,069,00093.4%322173392,9432917396452ap2003
2003980,0001,050,39493.3%303173203,0623217396452ap2004
2004944,0501,011,86293.3%243162593,6442931347337ap2005
2006916,7361,011,86290.6%218132313,9683114344334ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013