Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Joseph Louage, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Dacca, Bangladesh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1825Born
31 May 185327.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 187145.3ProfessedPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
21 Nov 189065.1AppointedBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh
11 Jan 189165.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh
8 Jun 189468.7DiedBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Augustin Joseph Louage
Bishop Augustin Joseph Louage C.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Dacca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTourcoing, Diocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopCollege Ste Croix, Neuilly sur Seine

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 237
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018