Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Marie Duboin, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Senegambia

Titular Bishop of Raphanea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1827BornSamoëns, France
10 Feb 185123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
20 Jun 187648.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal
20 Jun 187648.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Raphanea
20 Jun 187648.7AppointedPrefect of Sénégal
30 Jul 187648.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Raphanea
18 Jun 1883³55.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal
18 Jun 1883³55.7ResignedPrefect of Sénégal
26 Aug 189365.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Senegambia, Senegal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Marie Duboin:
Bishop François-Marie Duboin C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Senegambia

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 476

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013