Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie-Raoul Le Bas de Courmont, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zanguebar, Kenya

Titular Bishop of Bodona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1841Born
6 Jun 186827.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Aug 186827.3ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
23 Nov 188342.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Zanguebar, Kenya
23 Nov 188342.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bodona
16 Dec 188342.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bodona
27 Nov 189655.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Zanguebar, Kenya
20 Feb 192583.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zanguebar, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie-Raoul Le Bas de Courmont (VIAF: 17535062)
Bishop Jean-Marie-Raoul Le Bas de Courmont C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zanguebar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Carbet, France
Ordained Bishop30, rue Lhomond, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 151
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 88
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,883, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast